Roles - Ian McClelland
Current and Past
Member of Parliament
Constituency | Province / Territory | Start Date | End Date |
---|---|---|---|
Edmonton Southwest | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Offices and Roles as a Parliamentarian
Parliament | Office or Role | Start Date | End Date |
---|---|---|---|
36th | Deputy Chair Of Committees of the Whole | Tuesday, October 12, 1999 | Sunday, October 22, 2000 |
36th | Deputy Chair Of Committees of the Whole | Tuesday, September 23, 1997 | Saturday, September 18, 1999 |
Election Candidate
Date | Election Type | Constituency | Province / Territory | Result |
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, June 2, 1997 | General Election | Edmonton Southwest | Alberta | Re-Elected |